Agboola, Olusegun Oluyinka (CPSO#: 45882)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olusegun Agboola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015