Ageel, Hossain Ibrahim Ali (CPSO#: 80308)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 27 Nov 2003 to 19 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 20 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 26 Nov 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Nov 2004