Ages, Deena Elka (CPSO#: 62442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
770 Lawrence Ave. W.
Toronto ON  M6A 3C6
Phone: (416) 256-9642
Fax: (416) 256-9638
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ages Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ages ( CPSO# 62442 )

Business Address:
770 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3C6
Phone Number: (416) 256-9642

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEENA ELKA AGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1991