Aggarwal, Ram Kumar (CPSO#: 68364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: Kumar, Ram (used until: 10 Oct 1995 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:The Medical College of Wisconsin, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6175 HIGHWAY #7
UNITS 19 to 22
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: 877-783-3274
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ram K. Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aggarwal ( CPSO# 68364 )

Business Address:
Units 19 to 22
6175 Highway #7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 850-3091

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAM KUMAR AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 02 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998