Agha, Maurice (CPSO#: 106790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Second Floor
24 Dalhousie Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2A5
Phone: 18888783563
Fax: (416) 981-8939
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Carlton St
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Canada
Phone: 416-646-1890
Fax: 416-646-1892
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Stokes St
Toronto ON  M6J1H4
Canada
Phone: 4165358501
Fax: 4165831374
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

505 Consumer Road
suite 901
North York ON  M2J 4V8
Canada
Phone: (416) 631 0298
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Agha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Agha ( CPSO# 106790)

Business Address:
True North Medical Centres
69 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Phone Number: (888) 878-3563

Business Address:
206 - 3910 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M3H 5Z3
Phone Number: (647) 227-8976

Business Address:
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (647) 227-8976

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAURICE AGHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2017