Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Aghazaman Kashani, Soudabeh (CPSO#: 65926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore Village Walk In
Medical Centre
2885 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 1J1
Phone: (416) 259-5100
Fax: (416) 259-6958
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Aghazaman Kashani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aghazaman Kashani ( CPSO# 65926 )

Business Address:
Lakeshore Village Walk In
Medical Centre
2885 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8V 1J1
Phone Number: (416) 259-5000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOUDABEH AGHAZAMAN KASHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGHAZAMAN KASHANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1992

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 9, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)