Agid, Ofer (CPSO#: 76591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Dec 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
Department of Psychiatry
1001 Queen St West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ofer Agid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Agid ( CPSO# 76591 )

Business Address:
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Dec 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Aug 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ofer Agid may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr. Agid holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and 
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when  Dr.  Agid  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.