Ago, Casely Tetteh (CPSO#: 61940)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 03 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2008