Agrawal, Sumit Kishore (CPSO#: 76109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital-Otolaryngology
Room B1-333
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3568
Fax: (519) 663-3916
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Agrawal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Agrawal ( CPSO# 76109 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Otolaryngology
339 Windermere Road
Room B1-333
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3568

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMIT KISHORE AGRAWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGRAWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2008