Aguanno, Jonathan Jason (CPSO#: 70121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Dundurn Medical Group
160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4K3
Phone: (905) 528-5480
Fax: (905) 389-1107
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Jason Aguanno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aguanno ( CPSO# 70121 )

Business Address:
Dundurn Medical Group
160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4K3
Phone Number: (905) 528-5480

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN JASON AGUANNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGUANNO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004