Agulefo, Nwafor Theodoric Chukwulobe (CPSO#: 24919)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo

Education:Dalhousie University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2008