Agulnik, Mark (CPSO#: 81093)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 19 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2006