Agyem, Kwesi Frempong (CPSO#: 95383)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Washington University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 05 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 05 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 05 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 05 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2016