Agzarian, John (CPSO#: 88485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Agzarian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Agzarian ( CPSO# 88485 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Suite T2105
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN AGZARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGZARIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2017