Ah Now, Walter (CPSO#: 21299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
933 Liverpool Road
Pickering ON  L1W 1S7
Phone: (905) 839-1133
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walter Ah Now Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ah Now ( CPSO# 21299 )

Business Address:
933 Liverpool Road
Pickering ON  L1W 1S7
Phone Number: (905) 839-1133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER AH NOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AH NOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1968