Ah-Sue, Sheri Lynn (CPSO#: 88163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
1001 Queen St West
Toronto, ON
M6J 1H4
Toronto ON  M6J1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Sep 2007 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERI LYNN AH-SUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AH-SUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2008