Aheer, Mukhtiar Singh (CPSO#: 91407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Ross University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Langer's Family Medicine
9455 Mississauga Rd
Brampton ON  L6X 0B3
Phone: (905) 502 0605
Fax: 905 502 0608
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Restore Physiotherapy
1A Princess Anne Drive Unit 200
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Canada
Phone: 9057021840
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Genesis Family Walk in Clinic
221 Miller Dr, Unit 8-9
Georgetown ON  L7G6G4
Canada
Phone: 9058736776
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Athletes Care
Heart Lake Town Centre
Unit B
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Canada
Phone: (905) 495-4409
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukhtiar S. Aheer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aheer ( CPSO# 91407 )

Business Address:
Athletes Care
Heart Lake Town Centre
Unit B
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Phone Number: (905) 495-4409

Business Address:
9455 Mississauga Road
Brampton ON  L6X 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 502-0605

Business Address:
1A Princess Anne Drive
Suite 200
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone Number: (905) 702-1840

Business Address:
Units 8-9
221 Miller Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 6G4
Phone Number: (905) 873-1001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUKHTIAR SINGH AHEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHEER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011