Ahimbisibwe, Asa (CPSO#: 85568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mbarara University of Science & Technolo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6H 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6380
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Uganda

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASA AHIMBISIBWE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AHIMBISIBWE is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. AHIMBISIBWE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AHIMBISIBWE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AHIMBISIBWE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AHIMBISIBWE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AHIMBISIBWE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 27 Nov 2012 to 14 Feb 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 15 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018