Ahlgren, Paul Donald (CPSO#: 31999)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001