Ahluwalia, Ajit Kaur (CPSO#: 50237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3530 Derry Road East
Suite 209
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 677-1919
Fax: (905) 677-1919
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajit Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ahluwalia ( CPSO# 50237 )

Business Address:
209 - 3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 677-1919

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AJIT KAUR AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1985