Ahluwalia, Renita (CPSO#: 88764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
Deparment of Dermatology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Fax: (416) 323-7314
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

AVANT DERM
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Canada
Phone: (416) 869-3376
Fax: (416) 365-7546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MEDCAN CLINIC
150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renita Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ahluwalia ( CPSO# 88764 )

Business Address:
Womens College Hospital
Deparment of Dermatology
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
AVANT DERM
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Phone Number: (416) 869-3376

Business Address:
MEDCAN CLINIC
150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENITA AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013