Ahluwalia, Vandana (CPSO#: 61100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: Chaudhry, Vandana (used until: 19 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 799-1850 Ext. 221
Fax: (905) 799-8040
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Nalin and Vandana Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ahluwalia ( CPSO# 62854 )
Dr. V. Ahluwalia ( CPSO# 61100 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6J 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 799-1850

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 May 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 19 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANDANA AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1990