Ahmad, Belal (CPSO#: 77625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Belal Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ahmad ( CPSO# 77625 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BELAL AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008