Ahmad, Ghias (CPSO#: 22528)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 7 Penwood Crescent North York, ON M3B 3B1
Date Received: 12 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016