Ahmad, Marium Fatima (CPSO#: 89358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
College of Medicine
Qassim Univeristy
PO Box 143
Buraidah 51411
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966163800050 Ext. 6032
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston-Morningside Medical Centre
4500 Kingston Rd
Suite 204
Scarborough ON  M1E 2N9
Canada
Phone: 416-287-3100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.F. Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIUM FATIMA AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2010