Ahmad, Mohamad (CPSO#: 71103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58525
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohamad Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ahmad ( CPSO# 71103 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMAD AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2002