Ahmad, Nabeel (CPSO#: 110888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
26 Forbes St
Cambridge ON  N3C 2E2
Phone: 519 658 4615
Fax: 5196584630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nabeel Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ahmad ( CPSO# 110888)

Business Address:
4 - 156 Guelph Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 873-8880

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NABEEL AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2017