Ahmad, Omar Zaid (CPSO#: 75788)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2000 to 10 Jan 2001
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 10 Dec 2001 to 03 Jan 2002
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2002