Ahmad Sabry, Mohammad Hazem Ibrahim (CPSO#: 83949)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alexandria, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2006 to 13 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Feb 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006