Ahmad, Sameena Zareen (CPSO#: 80233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
R.M.C.A.D.
2nd Floor - Main
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8247
Fax: (416) 586-8766
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEENA ZAREEN AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2003 to 08 Oct 2003
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2006