Ahmad, Tabassum (CPSO#: 82839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aga Khan University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
410 S Mcknight Rd
St Louis MO  63124
United States
Phone: 314-442-6903

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Maryland
USA - Missouri

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TABASSUM AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2010