Ahmad, Yusra Naifa (CPSO#: 94494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Yonge St. Medical Centre
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M4Y 1X9
Phone: (647)920-1666
Fax: 416-920-4163
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yusra Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ahmad ( CPSO# 94494 )

Business Address:
Medical Centre
Suite 308
500 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1X9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUSRA NAIFA AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013