Ahmed, Bashir (CPSO#: 64062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Hindi, Iranian, Pushto, Urdu

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V4
Phone: (613) 244-2005
Fax: (613) 244-2004
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Ahmed & Dr. S. Al-Bakkal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 13 2012


Corporation Name: Dr. Bashir Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ahmed ( CPSO# 64062 )

Business Address:
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V4
Phone Number: (613) 244-2005

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASHIR AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992