Ahmed, Iqbal Karim (CPSO#: 69093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Millway Plaza
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 820-0111
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7700 Hurontario Street, Unit 605
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 459-5085
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. K. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ahmed ( CPSO# 69093 )

Business Address:
Prism Eye Institute
207 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
Millway Plaza
Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 820-6789

Business Address:
Suite 605
7700 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4491

Business Address:
Suite 602
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
Suite 101
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (877) 852-2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IQBAL KARIM AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000