Ahmed, Mohammed Sayeed (CPSO#: 99979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu

Education:Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 EGLINTON AVENUE WEST
Mississauga ON  L5M2N1
Phone: 9058132200
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 2
90 RESOLUTION DRIVE
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Canada
Phone: (855) 8547325
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Sayeed Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ahmed ( CPSO# 99979 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Mohammed Sayeed Ahmed may practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
            only.