Ahmed, Nadeem Ajaz (CPSO#: 66655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Endoscopie Brunswick
1 Avenue Holiday, Suite 115
Pointe-Claire QC  H9R 5N3
Phone: (514) 364-3636
Fax: (514) 459-3777

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADEEM AJAZ AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Jun 2006 to 21 Jul 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 11 Oct 2006 to 24 Oct 2006
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008