Ahmed, Nafeesa Quadeer-Uddin (CPSO#: 42579)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Ahmed, Nafeesa (used until: 07 Dec 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2007