Ahmed, Najma Nusarat (CPSO#: 69092)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: French

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004