Ahmed, Naseer (CPSO#: 63004)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Karachi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 30 Sep 1996 to 31 May 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2000 to 31 Mar 2000
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2000