Ahmed, Rahel (CPSO#: 76686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
414 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-2662 Ext. 3
Fax: (416) 439-0760
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Yukon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site Fort Albany
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHEL AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004