Ahmed, Shahida (CPSO#: 62999)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Karachi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1999 to 26 Mar 1999
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Mar 1999