Ahmed, Shajan (CPSO#: 93759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Xavier University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shajan Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 93759 )

Business Address:
Uhn Toronto Western Hospital
Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 15 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAJAN AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012