Ahmed, Syed Wajid (CPSO#: 88238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Essex County Health Unit
1005 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone: (519) 258-2146 Ext. 1436
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED WAJID AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 2008 to 06 Jul 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2015