Ahmed, Tahira Shah (CPSO#: 92303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Dec 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 242
600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4X9
Phone: (519) 252-6400
Fax: (519) 252-1700
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Tahira  Shah  Ahmed  may  practise  medicine  independently  as  a general
            practitioner limited to the performance of assessment and treatment of patients
            with  Attention  Deficit  Disorder (ADD) and/or Attention Deficit Hyperactivity
            Disorder (ADHD) and their co-morbidities, only.