Ahmed, Talat (CPSO#: 68501)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Patna University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997