Ahmed, Tasmia Munisha (CPSO#: 102801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Southern Florida, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TASMIA MUNISHA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015