Ahn, Duck Sun (CPSO#: 53548)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Korea University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1989 to 31 Mar 1990
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2012