Ahuja, Jan (CPSO#: 27809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
1220 Place d'Orleans
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone: (613) 841-5389
Fax: (613) 841-5393
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jan Ahuja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ahuja ( CPSO# 27809 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
1220 Place d'Orleans
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 841-5389

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN AHUJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHUJA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1978