Aiello, Michael John (CPSO#: 88430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
5303 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M1
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: (613) 746-6018
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J Aiello Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aiello ( CPSO# 88430 )

Business Address:
Suite 8
5303 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M1
Phone Number: (613) 746-6223

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN AIELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AIELLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010