Aiken, Caroline Loretta Mclean (CPSO#: 68767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
1300 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Phone: (905) 849-4576
Fax: (905) 849-7856
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE LORETTA MCLEAN AIKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AIKEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010